IL HB0806 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that an inmate may not receive nor possess a photograph of a minor under 18 years of age while incarcerated in an institution or facility of the Department of Corrections if he or she has been convicted of any of the following offenses if the victim of the offense was under 18 years of age at the time of the commission of the offense: (1) criminal sexual assault; (2) aggravated criminal sexual assault; (3) predatory criminal sexual assault of a child; (4) criminal sexual abuse; (5) aggravated criminal sexual abuse; (6) a substantially similar offense under the laws of the United States, another state, or foreign jurisdiction; or (7) a predecessor offense to any of these offenses.
Title
CHILD SEX OFFENDER-CHILD PHOTO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-02-16 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-8-7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |