IL HB0806 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Methamphetamine Precursor Control Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Sen. John Sullivan [D] |
Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0371 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2013 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 014-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-04-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 648 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |