IL HB0800 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a school building code.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0485 |
2015-11-20 | House | Effective Date November 20, 2015 |
2015-11-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-11-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-10-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-10-20 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 6, 2015 |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-08-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-08-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-08-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-006-000 |
2015-08-05 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-08-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-08-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-08-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-003-000 |
2015-08-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-07-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-07-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-07-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-07-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-07-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-07-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-07-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-07-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-07-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |