IL HB0795 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. Provides that all motor vehicles purchased or leased for one year or more by a State agency shall have a Vehicle Identification Number that begins with the number one, the number 2, the number 4, or the number 5. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NORTH AMERICAN-MADE VEHICLES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-20HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-05HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-03HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-03HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-14HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-14HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-01-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3051735New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback