IL HB0793 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that school districts need not comply with and may discharge any mandate or requirement placed on school districts by the Code or by administrative rules adopted by the State Board of Education that is unfunded; with exceptions. Provides that before a school district may lawfully discharge an unfunded mandate, it must hold a public hearing on the matter; sets forth requirements concerning the hearing. Requires a school board to report each unfunded mandate it has discharged to the State Board of Education, and requires the State Board to compile and report this information to the General Assembly each year. Repeals a Section of the Code concerning an unfunded mandates prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-UNFUNDED MANDATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Special Issues Subcommittee
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105522-60Repealed CodeCitation Text
105522-62New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback