IL HB0786 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0472
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Park District Code. Prohibits a park district from knowingly engaging a volunteer who has been convicted of or found to be a child sex offender. Provides that every park district shall require volunteers to complete an application prior to beginning work as a volunteer, which shall include a question concerning whether they have been convicted of or found to be a child sex offender. Provides that if a current volunteer is convicted of or found to be a child sex offender, the volunteer shall immediately disclose the conviction or finding to the park district. Provides for penalties for a volunteer who fails to disclose his or her sex offender status. Defines "volunteer" to mean any individual who, without compensation or benefits, reports to, and is under the direct supervision of, a park district's administrative staff and provides personal services to a park district recreational program that is offered to children. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PARK DISTRICTS-VOLUNTEERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-08HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0472
2017-09-08HouseEffective Date September 8, 2017
2017-09-08HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-21HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-24HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-24HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-24House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 096-000-001
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-29HouseArrived in House
2017-05-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez
2017-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-06SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-16HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7012058-23aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=786&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0786.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0786eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0786enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0472.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0786ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0786sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0786sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0786_03232017_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB0786_05292017_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0786_06242017_008000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback