IL HB0778 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides a person also commits a hate crime if by reason of the actual or perceived employment as a peace officer of another individual, regardless of the existence of any other motivating factor or factors, he or she commits assault, battery, aggravated assault, misdemeanor theft, criminal trespass to residence, misdemeanor criminal damage to property, criminal trespass to vehicle, criminal trespass to real property, mob action, disorderly conduct, harassment by telephone, or harassment through electronic communications. Penalty is a Class 4 felony for a first offense and a Class 2 felony for a second or subsequent offense, unless committed in certain specified locations in which case the penalty is a Class 3 felony for a first offense and a Class 2 felony for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
CRIM CD - HATE CRIME
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-16 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=778&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0778.htm |