IL HB0769 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Requires that each July 31 the Governor must report to the General Assembly and the public upon the fiscal impact of all executive orders issued or signed during the previous fiscal year. Specifies the items that must be included for each executive order to reflect the cost of implementing, administering, and enforcing the order and the percentage of those costs borne by current and future appropriations. Effective immediately.
Title
EXEC ORDER FISCAL IMPACT
Sponsors
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] |
Rep. Michael Smith [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-19 | First Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 19, 2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-09 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Cavaletto |