IL HB0768 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-05 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Charter Schools Law of the School Code. Removes provisions allowing the State Charter School Commission to reverse a school board's decision to deny, revoke, or not renew a charter; makes related changes. Provides that if a charter school applicant submits a proposal to a school board outside of the process adopted by that school board for receiving charter school proposals on an annual basis, the applicant shall not have any right to submit its proposal to the State Charter School Commission as otherwise authorized. In a provision concerning a charter school proposed to be jointly authorized by 2 or more school districts and the school boards unanimously denying the charter school proposal with a statement that the school boards are not opposed to the charter school, but that they yield to the Commission in light of the complexities of joint administration, allows the charter applicant to submit the proposal to the Commission and requires the Commission to follow the same process and be subject to the same timelines for review as a school board. Allows the Commission to approve an application for a charter if certain conditions are met. Provide that the Commission may condition approval of an application on the acceptance of funding in an amount less than requested. Provides that final decisions of the Commission are subject to judicial review under the Administrative Review Law. Provides that if the Commission approves an application for a charter school, then the Commission shall act as the authorized chartering entity. Provides that if the Commission is the authorized chartering entity, then the Commission shall execute a charter agreement (instead of approve the charter agreement). Provides that the Commission has no authority to approve a charter school proposal that has been denied by a school board. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ST CHARTER SCH COMM'N

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-05HousePassed Both Houses
2017-12-05SenateMotion Withdrawn Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-29SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 033-017-002
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass Executive; 011-004-001
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-17SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-17SenateRe-referred to Executive
2017-05-17SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-17SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-15SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-12SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-26HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-046-000
2017-04-26HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-04-26HouseMotion - Move to Previous Question Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2017-04-24HouseMotion Prevailed 061-049-000
2017-04-24HouseNote / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-24HouseFiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2017-04-24HouseMotion Prevailed 061-049-000
2017-04-24HouseNote / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-29HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-008-000
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-13HouseRe-assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527A-7.5Amended CodeCitation Text
105527A-8Amended CodeCitation Text
105527A-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback