IL HB0762 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - To Ballott Access Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Changes the threshold at which a party must poll to be considered a political party, rather than a new political party, from 5% of the entire vote cast in the State in the general election for State and county officers then next preceding a primary to 2%. Includes the President of the United States in the definition of "state office" or "state officer" for certain purposes. Reduces various signature requirements to form a new political party. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-BALLOT ACCESS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06HouseTo Ballott Access Subcommittee
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10510-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10510-2Amended CodeCitation Text
10510-3Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-2Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-4Amended CodeCitation Text
1058-2Amended CodeCitation Text
1058-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback