IL HB0760 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions of the School Code concerning debt limitations. Provides that notwithstanding other provisions of law, bonds issued by East Prairie School District 73 with an aggregate principal amount not to exceed $47,353,147 and approved by the voters of the district at the general election held on November 8, 2016, and any bonds issued to refund or continue to refund the bonds, shall not be considered indebtedness for the purposes of any statutory debt limitation and may mature within not to exceed 25 years from their date, notwithstanding any other law to the contrary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-EAST PRAIRIE BONDING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 69 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-28HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-28HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 069-040-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Education; 011-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-045-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105519-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback