IL HB0747 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that notwithstanding whether the laws of the state or territory where the non-resident resides related to firearm ownership, possession, and carrying, are substantially similar to the requirements to obtain a license under the Act, the Department of State Police shall by rule allow for a non-resident license application if the applicant is an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States stationed in this State or the spouse of an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States stationed in this State. Provides that the applicant shall pay the resident license or renewal fees (rather than the non-resident fees). Effective immediately.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY FEE-MILITARY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Tabled |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Discharge Committee Tabled |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-02-16 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=747&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0747.htm |