IL HB0741 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that upon application for a license as a community mental health or developmental services agency to the Department of Human Services, the Department may issue a temporary permit to an applicant for up to a 2-year period (currently, a 6-month period) to allow the holder of such permit reasonable time to become eligible for a license under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CILA-TEMPORARY PERMIT PERIOD
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] |
Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 135 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |