IL HB0739 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that a public or private agency, association, partnership, corporation, or organization that has had a license revoked under a specified provision of the Act may not apply for or possess a license under a different name. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CILA-REVOKED LICENSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2101354Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback