IL HB0738 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Alternative Health Care Delivery Act. In provisions regarding demonstration program requirements, requires there to be 6 (rather than 4) birth center alternative health care models in the demonstration program located in the area comprising Cook, DuPage, Kane, Lake, McHenry, and Will counties, 2 (rather than one) of which shall be owned or operated by a federally qualified health center. Provides that one birth center alternative health care model in the demonstration program shall be located within Planning Area A-3 to address the disparate perinatal and child health outcomes in Planning Area A-3. Provides that birth centers located in Planning Area A-3 or operated by a federally qualified health center are exempt from the requirements of the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act or successor Acts. Effective immediately.
Title
ALTERNATIVE HEALTH CARE MODELS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0414 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-03-11 | House | Re-assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-01 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 3 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |