IL HB0738 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Creates the STEM Teachers Loan Repayment Program to encourage academically talented Illinois students to enter and continue teaching in Illinois schools in the fields of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to administer the program. Subject to a separate appropriation made for such purposes, provides that each year the Commission shall award a grant to each qualified applicant in an amount equal to the amount of higher education loans he or she must repay that year. Provides that an applicant must agree to teach in a public secondary school in this State in the field of science, technology, engineering, or mathematics for a period of at least 5 years beginning with the first year of acceptance of a grant. Provides for repayment of the grant amount if a grant recipient fails to fulfill this teaching requirement. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
HIGHER ED-LOAN FORGIV-TEACHER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-29 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-01-27 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 | |
2009-08-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee; (Table Amendment) | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-03-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-03-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-03-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2009-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 006-001-000 | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Higher Education Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-02-23 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-02-06 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=738&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0738.htm |