IL HB0737 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that after a community mental health or developmental services agency's license has been revoked, it shall continue providing for the health, safety, and welfare of the individuals it was serving by ensuring residents have been fully informed of their rights and options within time frames to be specified in rule and by a specified private, not-for-profit corporation directed by the Governor to administer the State plan to protect and advocate for the rights of persons with developmental disabilities. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CILA-REVOKED LICENSE-AGENCIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2017
2017-05-05SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2101356Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback