IL HB0736 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish a small business grant program for public aid recipients who are interested in developing a new start-up business. Requires grant applicants to submit an initial business plan or proposal to the Department that clearly articulates the viability of the new start-up business and how the grant money will be used to develop the business. Provides that the Department shall use such application materials to determine an applicant's eligibility under the program, the grant amount to be awarded, if applicable, and the number of grants an eligible applicant will receive under the program. Provides that if an applicant is determined by the Department to be eligible for a small business grant, the applicant must submit to the Department every year that he or she participates in the program or applies for a new grant an updated business plan or proposal that demonstrates the continued viability or progress of the new start-up business. Requires the Department to adopt any rules necessary to implement the program, including rules on the minimum and maximum grant amounts awarded under the program, the number of grants an applicant may apply for or receive during a specified period of time, and application requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-SMALL BUSINESS GRANT PGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 007-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-004-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Economic Opportunity Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.50New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback