IL HB0733 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Clean Election Act. Establishes a voluntary method of public financing of the campaigns of candidates for Governor, State Senator, and State Representative. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Illinois Clean Election Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to create an individual tax return checkoff in support of the Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
IL CLEAN ELECTION ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Boland |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=733&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0733.htm |