IL HB0732 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Roofing Industry Licensing Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to require an employee who performs roofing or waterproofing work to his or her employer's residential property, where there exists an employee-employer relationship or for no consideration, to be licensed as a roofing contractor. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to require a person who performs roof repair (rather than roofing) or waterproofing work to his or her employer's commercial or industrial property (rather than his or her employer's property) to be licensed as a roofing contractor, where there exists an employer-employee relationship. Defines "roof repair". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROOFING WORK/REPAIR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 77 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0545
2017-11-09HouseEffective Date November 8, 2017
2017-11-08HouseBoth Houses Override Total Veto
2017-11-08SenateOverride Governor Veto - Senate Passed 040-013-000
2017-11-08Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-07SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-11-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-11-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-11-02SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-11-01SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto
2017-10-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-10-25HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Passed 077-034-000
2017-10-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-25HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-10-25HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-10-25HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-10-12HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Vetoed
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-017-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-003-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-04HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 079-030-002
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-004-000
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22533511Amended CodeCitation Text
2253352Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=732&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0732.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0732eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0732enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0732gms.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0545.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0732ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0732_04042017_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB0732_05292017_060000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0732_10252017_012000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB0732_11082017_002000M.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback