IL HB0728 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Government Wage Increase Transparency Act. Changes the title of the Act to the Local Government Wage and Fee Transparency Act. Provides that for any attorney that has 2 or more clients that are units of local government, the attorney shall perform an annual audit of all: (1) fees and charges billed to, and paid by, each unit of local government client; (2) referral fees paid by the attorney to a person or business for the referral of a unit of local government to the attorney; and (3) referral fees paid to the attorney for referring a unit of local government to another attorney. Provides for filing and disclosure requirements of completed audits. Amends the Open Meetings Act making conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOV ATTORNEYS-FEE AUDITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51202Amended CodeCitation Text
501551Amended CodeCitation Text
5015510New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback