IL HB0721 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law or administrative rule to the contrary, beginning in fiscal year 2018, the specified threshold for working families must be no less than 185% of the then-current federal poverty level for each family size. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD CARE-INCOME THRESHOLD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-10HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-10HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30559A-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback