IL HB0715 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Deletes existing preemption provisions concerning firearms. Provides that regulation of the ownership and possession of firearms and related items are the exclusive powers and functions of the State. Provides that a local government, including a home rule unit, may not require registration, reporting of the sale or transfer of a firearm, or maintenance of a firearm registry. Provides that any existing or future local ordinances or resolutions imposing any registration requirement on firearms and related items are invalid and void. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARMS- MUNICIPAL REGULATION
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Reginald Phillips [R] | Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=715&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0715.htm |