IL HB0711 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Circuit Courts Act. Provides that in the year following each federal decennial census, the General Assembly shall redraw the boundaries of the subcircuits of the Circuit of Cook County to reflect the results of the census.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIR COURTS-COOK SUBCIRCUITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-06-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-23HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 017-000-000
2017-06-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-06-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-06-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-06-13HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-13HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseTo Ballot Access Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
705352fAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback