IL HB0706 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0082
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0082
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Veterans' Health Insurance Program Act of 2008. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall arrange for the conducting of an evaluation regarding the availability of and access to health care for veterans who are residents of Illinois, taking into consideration the program established by the Act, programs and services provided by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, and programs and services otherwise provided by and available through other public and private entities. Provides that the evaluation shall determine whether there are limitations or barriers to care, gaps in service, or other deficits that should be overcome to ensure that veterans are provided appropriate and high-quality care. Requires a report to the Governor and the General Assembly by March 1, 2010. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-VETS HEALTH INSURANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-27 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0082 | |
2009-07-27 | Effective Date July 27, 2009 | |
2009-07-27 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-05-13 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-01 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 022-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-02-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2009-02-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-02-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-02-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham |