IL HB0704 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Surrogate Act. Provides that "attending physician", "health care provider", and "qualified physician" include a physician licensed in the state where the patient is being treated. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTHCARE SURROGATE-PHYSICIAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0182 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date July 30, 2021 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 40 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |