IL HB0691 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning authorization of water and sewer surcharges by the Illinois Commerce Commission.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0630 |
2011-12-08 | House | Effective Date December 8, 2011 |
2011-12-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-12-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-11-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-018-000 |
2011-11-29 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 10, 2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 9, 2011 |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-003-000 |
2011-11-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 10, 2011 |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-10-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-039-002 |
2011-10-26 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-10-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 010-001-000 |
2011-10-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-10-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-10-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-19 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-10-19 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2011 |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 9-220.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |