IL HB0689 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Seizure and Forfeiture Reporting Act. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall establish and maintain on its official website a searchable public database that includes specified information about property seized and forfeited under State law and under any agreement with the federal government. Provides that every law enforcement agency that seizes property subject to reporting under the Act shall report the specified information required under the Act on a monthly basis. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority may recoup its costs under the Act by charging a fee to law enforcement agencies required to file a report. Provides that the Act applies to provisions of law that authorizes a law enforcement agency to seize property alleged to have been used in or derived from the commission of a criminal offense. Creates the Asset Forfeiture Proceeds Disbursement Law. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall award grants under the procedures of the Act for the disbursement of monies collected in the Asset Forfeiture Proceeds Fund. Amends various Acts concerning criminal forfeiture to make conforming changes. Changes most forfeiture distributions from law enforcement agencies to the Asset Forfeiture Proceeds Fund. Makes changes to the procedures and distribution of contraband proceeds to various governmental units and agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL FORFEITURE PROCEDURES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
4106203.23Amended CodeCitation Text
415544.1Amended CodeCitation Text
51068105-55Amended CodeCitation Text
51551-215Amended CodeCitation Text
52051.25Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-10.6Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-5Amended CodeCitation Text
720529B-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720529B-1.1New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-1.5New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-10New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-11New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-12New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-13New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-14New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-15New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-16New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-17New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-18New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-19New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-2New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-20New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-21New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-22New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-3New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-4New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-5New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-6New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-7New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-8New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-9New CodeSee Bill Text
720533G-6Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-1.1New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-1.2New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-1.3New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-1.4New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-1.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-1.6New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-1aRepealed CodeCitation Text
720536-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-2.1New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-3Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-3.1New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-3.2New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-5Repealed CodeCitation Text
720536-6New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-7New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-8New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-9New CodeSee Bill Text
720547-15Amended CodeCitation Text
72055012Amended CodeCitation Text
720570505Amended CodeCitation Text
72064685Amended CodeCitation Text
72515010Amended CodeCitation Text
72515014Repealed CodeCitation Text
72515015New CodeSee Bill Text
72515016New CodeSee Bill Text
72515017New CodeSee Bill Text
72515018New CodeSee Bill Text
72515019New CodeSee Bill Text
7251502Amended CodeCitation Text
72515020New CodeSee Bill Text
7251503.1New CodeSee Bill Text
7251503.2New CodeSee Bill Text
7251503.3New CodeSee Bill Text
7251503.5Amended CodeCitation Text
7251504Repealed CodeCitation Text
7251505Amended CodeCitation Text
7251505.1New CodeSee Bill Text
7251505.2New CodeSee Bill Text
7251506Repealed CodeCitation Text
7251507Repealed CodeCitation Text
7251508Amended CodeCitation Text
7251509Amended CodeCitation Text
7251509.5New CodeSee Bill Text
7251755Amended CodeCitation Text
7251756.5New CodeSee Bill Text
7255124B-1030Repealed CodeCitation Text
7255124B-1040Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-195New CodeSee Bill Text
7255124B-305Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-420Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-505Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-605Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-715Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-825Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-935Amended CodeCitation Text
74014740Amended CodeCitation Text
815511Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback