IL HB0689 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Fiscal Note Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Fiscal Note Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cigarette Machine Operators' Occupation Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2016-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-04-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-08-11 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-08-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-08-11 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 128 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |