IL HB0688 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Firefighter and Chicago Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Authorizes a firefighter to transfer up to 10 years of creditable service in a downstate firefighter pension fund to the Firemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago upon payment of a specified amount. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-DWNST FIRE-TRANSFER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-23HouseVerified
2017-06-23HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-23HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-23House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 072-022-000
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-006-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-29HouseArrived in House
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-010-002
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
2017-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-001-001
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 082-033-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-06HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-006-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-28HousePension Note Filed
2017-03-27HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-27HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-23HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-006-000
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-108.6Amended CodeCitation Text
4056-227Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback