IL HB0678 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that an alleged juvenile delinquent must be brought before a judicial officer within 24 hours (rather than 40 hours) to determine further custody and that an initial detention hearing shall be no later than the morning after the juvenile arrived in placement, including weekends and holidays. Provides that if the juvenile is hospitalized or receiving treatment, the 24-hour period will not begin until the juvenile is released from the hospital or treatment center. Provides that if false information is given by the juvenile as to age, the 24-hour period will begin once it is determined that the juvenile is subject to the Act. Provides that the minor must be released from custody at the expiration of the 24-hour period if the minor is not brought before a judicial officer within that period. Provides that after the initial 24-hour period has lapsed, the court may review the minor's custodial status at any time prior to the trial or sentencing hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-HEARING WITHIN 24 HR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-13HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-003-000
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-415Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback