IL HB0677 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Home Birth Safety Act. Provides for the licensure of midwives by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and for certain limitations on the activities of licensed midwives. Creates the Illinois Midwifery Board. Sets forth provisions concerning application, qualifications, grounds for disciplinary action, and administrative procedures. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to set a repeal date for the new Act of January 1, 2028. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987, the Nurse Practice Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code to make related changes.
Title
HOME BIRTH SAFETY ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 50-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |