IL HB0657 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the Secretary of State to issue Force Combat Action Medal license plates to residents who have been awarded the Air Force Combat Action Medal. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
AIR FORCE COMBAT ACTION MEDAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |