IL HB0643 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Establishes the fiscal year 2018 mileage reimbursement rate and allowance for lodging and meals. Amends the Compensation Review Act. Prohibits cost-of-living adjustments for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2017 for State government legislative and executive elected officers and appointees in positions for which the Compensation Review Board previously recommended or determined compensation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA-PER DIEM & COLAS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-26HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0025
2017-07-26HouseEffective Date July 26, 2017
2017-07-26HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-07-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-07-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-07-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-07-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-30SenateDo Pass Executive; 015-000-000
2017-05-30SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-25SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-03-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-14SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-003-001
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251151Amended CodeCitation Text
251206.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback