IL HB0642 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-28 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-28 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Operations Act. Provides that no person may serve more than 10 consecutive years in any of the following leadership roles: Speaker of the House of Representatives, President of the Senate, Minority Leader of the House of Representatives, and Minority Leader of the Senate. Provides that the limitations imposed by the amendatory Act apply to service beginning on and after the second Wednesday in January of 2023.
Title
GA LEADER TERM LIMITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 20, 2021 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading August 31, 2021 |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-001 |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |