IL HB0639 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that any person who possesses for an unlawful purpose another person's Electronic Benefit Transfer card (EBT) or LINK card in order to use or transfer in any manner not authorized by law or the rules and regulations of the Department of Human Services the cash assistance benefits held on that EBT or LINK card is guilty of a violation and shall be subject to certain penalties established under the Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-LINK-CASH ASSISTANCE FRAUD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseTo Public Benefits Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30558A-4BNew CodeSee Bill Text
30558A-5AAmended CodeCitation Text
30558A-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback