IL HB0637 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Lowers the age at which a person who is not an active duty member of the United States Armed Forces may apply for a Firearm Owner's Identification Card from 21 to 18 and provides that a person who is under 18 years of age may apply for a Firearm Owner's Identification Card without parental consent required if he or she is an active duty member of the United States Armed Forces. Provides that if the applicant is under 18 (rather than 21) years of age, the applicant must submit evidence to the Illinois State Police that he or she has never been convicted of a misdemeanor other than a traffic offense or adjudged delinquent and is an active duty member of the United States Armed Forces.
Title
FOID-AGE-PARENTAL CONSENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=637&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0637.htm |