IL HB0633 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Garden Act. Provides for the right to cultivate a vegetable garden and permits State and local regulation. Defines "vegetable garden". Limits home rule powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEGETABLE GARDEN PROTECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-30HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0180
2021-07-30HouseEffective Date January 1, 2022
2021-07-30HouseGovernor Approved
2021-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-27HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-009-000
2021-05-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2021-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
2021-05-13SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
2021-05-12SenateDo Pass Local Government; 007-001-000
2021-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-05-04SenateAssigned to Local Government
2021-04-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-22SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-22SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-024-000
2021-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 007-001-000
2021-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2021-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-04HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback