IL HB0625 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that whenever a pedestrian crossing warning sign with a rectangular rapid flashing beacon is in place at an intersection where traffic control signals are not in place or at a plainly marked crosswalk, a driver of a vehicle shall yield the right-of-way to a pedestrian when the rectangular rapid flashing beacon is activated. Defines "rectangular rapid flashing beacon". Provides that a violation of the provision is a Class C misdemeanor, except that a violation of the provision that results in serious bodily injury or death to another is a Class 2 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-CROSSWALK-BEACON-YIELD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-09SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-09SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-05-09SenateRe-assigned to Criminal Law
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-003-006
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1002Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback