IL HB0619 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts from inspection and copying the following: records requested by a person committed to the Department of Corrections or a county jail, the disclosure of which would result in the risk of harm to any person or the risk of an escape from a jail or correctional institution or facility; records requested by a person in a county jail or committed to the Department of Corrections containing personal information pertaining to the person's victim or the victim's family, including, but not limited to, a victim's home address, home telephone number, work or school address, work telephone number, social security number, or any other identifying information, except as may be relevant to a requester's current or potential case or claim; and law enforcement records of other persons requested by a person committed to the Department of Corrections or a county jail, including, but not limited to, arrest and booking records, mug shots, and crime scene photographs, except as these records may be relevant to the requester's current or potential case or claim. Effective immediately.
Title
FOIA-EXEMPTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0026 |
2017-08-04 | House | Effective Date August 4, 2017 |
2017-08-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-16 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-009-001 |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Government Transparency Committee; 008-001-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Government Transparency Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Transparency Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-02-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Government Transparency Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |