IL HB0617 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0047
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends a Section of the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act regarding Internet gaming service providers. Changes "Internet gaming service provider" to "Internet game service provider" and makes various changes to the definition of the term. Provides that the Section applies only to agreements under which an Internet game service provider provides consumers access to its service or the games on its site, for home and personal use, on a paid subscription basis for a stated term that is automatically renewed for another term unless the consumer cancels the service (rather than to agreements under which an Internet gaming service provider provides service to consumers, for home and personal use, for a stated term that is automatically renewed for another term unless the consumer cancels the service). Provides that an Internet game service provider must give a consumer who is an Illinois resident instructions for canceling the paid subscription, and that these instructions should be posted on the Internet game service provider's web site (rather than providing that an Internet gaming service provider must give such a consumer a secure method at the provider's web site that the consumer may use to cancel the service, which method shall not require the consumer to make a telephone call or send U.S. Postal Service mail to effectuate the cancellation and instructions that the consumer may follow to cancel the service at the Internet gaming service provider's web site). Adds language providing that the Section does not require an Internet game service provider to adopt a particular method of cancellation. Effective January 1, 2010.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSUMER FRAUD-INTERNET GAMES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-07-17 Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0047
2009-07-17 Effective Date July 17, 2009
2009-07-17 Governor Approved
2009-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2009-05-13 Passed Both Houses
2009-05-13 Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2009-05-07 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009
2009-05-07 Second Reading
2009-04-30 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009
2009-04-30 Do Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 009-000-000
2009-04-22 Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2009-04-02 Referred to Assignments
2009-04-02 First Reading
2009-04-02 Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2009-04-02 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
2009-04-02 Arrive in Senate
2009-04-01 Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2009-03-31 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-31 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
2009-03-31 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
2009-03-31 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham
2009-03-31 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2009-03-30 Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-30 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-30 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2009-03-26 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-03-26 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
2009-03-25 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Computer Technology Committee; 007-000-000
2009-03-24 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Computer Technology Committee
2009-03-19 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-03-19 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
2009-03-12 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-12 Do Pass / Short Debate Computer Technology Committee; 007-000-000
2009-02-11 Assigned to Computer Technology Committee
2009-02-06 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-06 First Reading
2009-02-05 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback