IL HB0607 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rivers, Lakes, and Streams Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the jurisdiction of the Department of Natural Resources under the Act.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0106 |
2017-08-14 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-007-001 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-034-003 |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-03-30 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Re-assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
615 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |