IL HB0597 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equitable Restrooms Act. In provisions concerning baby changing station requirements, provides that whether a restaurant meets certain occupancy criteria is to be determined by the local fire department, fire protection district, building permitting entity, or building inspector (rather than the State Fire Marshal). Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0602 |
2019-12-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-12-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-12-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 14, 2019 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 13, 2019 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-10-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-10-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-10-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 20 | 0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |