IL HB0592 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 15, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-03-16 | House | Re-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |