IL HB0591 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to permit medical assistance recipients, including those enrolled in managed care, to obtain pharmacy services from the pharmacy of their choice if the pharmacy is licensed under the Pharmacy Practice Act and accepts the professional dispensing fee for pharmacy services as determined by the Department. Provides that no managed care organization that contracts with the Department to provide services to recipients may restrict a recipient's access to pharmacy services to a selected group of pharmacies. Provides that if a managed care organization merges with or is acquired by another entity, the resulting entity may not restrict a recipient's access to pharmacy services to a selected group of pharmacies. Permits the Department to renegotiate with the resulting entity the terms of the managed care contract the Department had with the original managed care organization prior to the merger or acquisition. Requires the Department to contract with an independent research organization to conduct a study and submit a report on those managed care organizations that are contracted to provide services to recipients. Requires the report to include an analysis of pharmacy access for medical assistance recipients with the aim of identifying "pharmacy deserts"; an analysis of the costs and benefits of having managed care organizations administer health care services, including pharmacy services, to recipients; and other matters. Prohibits the Department from entering into any new contract with a managed care organization before the report has been received and analyzed by the Department and posted on its website. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-PHARMACY ACCESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-11 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2021-04-19 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2021-04-19 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2021-04-16 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2021-04-16 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2021-04-16 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2021-04-16 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2021-04-16 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-16 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-16 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-16 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-16 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-16 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-16 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-16 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-16 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-006-000 |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |