IL HB0547 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Increases the base amount from $20,000 to $30,000 for public improvement or maintenance of public property at which a municipality must enter into a contract by public bid or four-fifths council approval. If the contract is approved by council, increases the base amount of expenses that must be taken by public bid from $20,000 to $30,000. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-CONTRACT EXPENDITURES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-001-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-03-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-22SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-046-001
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 010-004-000
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-02-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6554-5-11Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-9-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback