IL HB0539 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that county boards outside of the jurisdiction of boards of election commissioners may reduce the number of judges of election from 5 to 3 for primary elections. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-NUMBER OF ELEC JUDGES
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Sen. Jim Oberweis [R] |
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0337 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-011-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported Back To Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; |
2017-03-30 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-03-06 | House | To Election Administration Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 13-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 13-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |