IL HB0539 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that when the defendant is charged with a non-violent crime, in setting the amount of bail, the court shall consider any evidence offered as to the annual gross income of the defendant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-BAIL AMOUNT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-22 Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
2009-04-22 Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote
2009-04-03 Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Monique D. Davis
2009-03-13 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-09 Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
2009-02-04 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-04 First Reading
2009-02-04 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback