IL HB0537 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides for disclosure of certain items when a unit of local government proposes referenda seeking to impose or increase a retailers' occupation tax, a use tax, a service occupation tax, a service use tax, or a property tax, or regarding the issuance of bonds. Provides that such referenda may only appear on ballots once every 23 months. Provides for publication requirements. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTION CD-REVENUE REFERENDA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-002-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10528-8.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback