IL HB0535 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission (currently, a court of competent jurisdiction) will determine whether the installation, maintenance, repair, or removal of a community antenna would create a dangerous condition or interrupt service. Amends the Crossing of Railroad Right-of-way Act. Adds providers of broadband service to the definition of "utility". Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that cable operators, holders of State authorizations, and broadband service providers shall not be prevented by a railroad from entering onto railroad real estate or right of way for purposes of construction or installation of system or facilities if they have followed the procedures to enter the property as required by statute. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ICC AND RAILROAD RIGHTS-OF-WAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 007-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenatePostponed - Energy and Public Utilities
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 017-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 015-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220705Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1096Amended CodeCitation Text
625518c-7401Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-42-11.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback